U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Twiss
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 25, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 10, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2016: [Request]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.