U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-10029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • July 11, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 10, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • July 10, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 12, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • June 12, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • June 12, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 27, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 02, 2017: [Request for Garnishment Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • October 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2017: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • October 06, 2017: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • October 06, 2017: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.