U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-10011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taken Alive
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 30, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • October 07, 2024: [Reduce Sentence (Part A & B Criminal History Amendment)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Extend]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • September 20, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 19, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • April 26, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 25, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Mail Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 16, 2021: [Discovery]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Objection]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 16, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2018: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • April 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • September 07, 2016: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.