U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-10017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 02, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 11, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 09, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 19, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 16, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 14, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 22, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.