U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-10013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keeble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • October 05, 2017: [Answer of Garnishee]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2017: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.