U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sparling
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 12, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.