U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:01-cr-10007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eastman, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 12, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • May 12, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 16, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 15, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2017: [Request]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 08, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 08, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.