U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez Rubacalba
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 22, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 20, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 20, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 27, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 28, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 21, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 21, 2016: [Discovery]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.