U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 07, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 27, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • July 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 27, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 27, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 26, 2016: [Request]
  • April 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.