U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomes-Pineda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 23, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 17, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 17, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 06, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2016: [Request]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • April 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.