U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Enriquez-Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 10, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 20, 2016: [Discovery]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2016: [Arrest]
  • April 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.