U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-30030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Wing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 21, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 08, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 11, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 11, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 11, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 13, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 26, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 07, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 10, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 04, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.