U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-30065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hacker et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 13, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • October 06, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 20, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • January 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 17, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 20, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.