U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-30053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirkie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • October 30, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • October 30, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.