U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:98-cr-10018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taken Alive
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 22, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • May 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 22, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 22, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 22, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2025: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • May 20, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 16, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 15, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 15, 2025: [Indictment]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.