U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kills Warrior
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Release from Custody]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 19, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2020: [Release from Custody]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 27, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • March 20, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 14, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 11, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 11, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Request]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Arrest]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.