U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-10050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Demarrias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 20, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 20, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 23, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 23, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 14, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.