U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-30113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Request]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 21, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 18, 2020: [Response]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 14, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 08, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 04, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Admission]
  • August 27, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 27, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 24, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 17, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
  • April 06, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.