U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-30106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shields
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 12, 2021: [Response]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extend]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • December 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 07, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.