U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-30050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smashed Ice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • September 13, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • June 07, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.