U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-30077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Answer of Garnishee]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Certificate]
  • July 12, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • July 12, 2021: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • July 12, 2021: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.