U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farlee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • March 17, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 30, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.