U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelly et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 14, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 13, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.