U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flammond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 16, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • October 29, 2019: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 08, 2019: [Furlough]
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 22, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.