U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 25, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.