U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garreau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 03, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.