U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lawrence
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Proposed Order]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Answer of Garnishee]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Certificate]
  • October 24, 2016: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • October 24, 2016: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.