U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoover
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 16, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • November 15, 2016: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • November 08, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 13, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.