U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Order]
  • March 19, 2018: [Proposed Order]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.