U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 28, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2021: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Request for Warrant]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.