U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-30036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 14, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 14, 2018: [Declaration]
  • February 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • January 29, 2018: [Request]
  • January 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • January 12, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • January 12, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.