U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barbosa-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 25, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.