U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 25, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 01, 2016: [Variance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 25, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 14, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 14, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 10, 2016: [Request]
  • June 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 24, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • May 24, 2016: [Suppress]
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 25, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.