U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:97-cr-30008-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bad Moccasin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Proposed Order]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Certificate]
  • September 02, 2016: [Answer of Garnishee]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Certificate]
  • August 23, 2016: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • August 23, 2016: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • August 23, 2016: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.