U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nickel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 17, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 22, 2017: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • May 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 15, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • April 06, 2017: [Transport Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 02, 2017: [Transport Defendant]
  • March 02, 2017: [Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 10, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.