U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-10009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lorenzen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 18, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.