U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lehnherr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 08, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 23, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 05, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 09, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 19, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 01, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 11, 2017: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 06, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.