U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-50109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kindle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • July 10, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • July 09, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.