U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:08-cr-40054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Helton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 12, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 05, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 03, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 26, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.