U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:10-cr-40109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Proposed Order]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.