U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:02-cr-40056-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Shaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Proposed Order]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • November 14, 2016: [Certificate]
  • November 14, 2016: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.