U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:95-cr-30098-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Stead
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • February 01, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Response]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 21, 2021: [Extend]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 07, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • January 06, 2021: [Supplement]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Admission]
  • December 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 15, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.