U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cr-40068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shields
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 28, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 21, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 20, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 19, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 20, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 31, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • July 25, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 27, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 26, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 26, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.