U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • April 24, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • April 24, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.