U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maddox et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 05, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 30, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 25, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 23, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2017: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 27, 2016: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • December 27, 2016: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • December 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 07, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 14, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.