U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 17, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 31, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2021: [Request]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.