U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.