U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-40068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cavanaugh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Mail Returned]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 17, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • July 17, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • July 17, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • January 29, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • January 17, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • January 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Answer of Garnishee]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2017: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • April 03, 2017: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • April 03, 2017: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.