U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-40034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dennis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Mail Returned]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 30, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • July 28, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • July 28, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice]
  • July 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 09, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 28, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 28, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2020: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Request for Warrant]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.