U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-40129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 28, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 27, 2022: [Certificate]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 12, 2022: [Strike ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Response]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 04, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 01, 2021: [Response]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • December 14, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Reconsideration]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.